EP 0730922 A1 19960911 - Method for producing castings which are later connected to concrete
Title (en)
Method for producing castings which are later connected to concrete
Title (de)
Verfahren zum Giessen von später mit Beton verbundenen Gussteilen
Title (fr)
Procédé de fabrication de pièces métalliques coulées qui sont liées au béton ultérieurement
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 95103388 A 19950309
Abstract (en)
The method is carried out into a sand mould formed by a permanent pattern (1). There is at least one internal projection (5) at the edge of the space later to be filled with concrete, thus forming a recoil base for the concrete. The pattern for the internal wall (2) of the space has a ring (6) at the point at which the edge projection is made. Before the pattern is removed, the ring is widened to the final dia. of the recoil. The ring is hollow and can be inflated. It may be a double-wedge spreading ring.
Abstract (de)
Gußteile, deren Hohlräume später mit Beton gefüllt werden, wie z.B. Deckel für befahrbare Schachtabdeckungen, müssen eine innige und dauerhafte Verbindung mit dem Beton eingehen. Diese Verbindung wird erfingungsgemäß durch einen Vorsprung (5) verbessert, der an den Rand des offenen Hohlraums angegossen wird. Der Beton wird dann regelrecht verklammert und kann sich nicht mehr lössen. Um den vorsprung ohne Kern formen zu können, wird vorgeschlagen, entweder am Dauermodell einen nach außen zurückziehbaren Ring (6) vorzesehen oder den Formsand an der Stelle des Randvorsprungs nach dem Entformen mit einem Werkzeug (23) abzutragen. Auch ein verlorenes Modellteil (22) für den Vorsprung ist denkbar. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B22C 7/00 (2006.01); B22C 7/02 (2006.01); B22C 9/10 (2006.01); B22C 9/22 (2006.01); B22C 23/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B22C 7/005 (2013.01); B22C 7/023 (2013.01); B22C 9/10 (2013.01); B22C 9/22 (2013.01); B22C 23/00 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [DA] DE 9206734 U1 19920806
- [A] GB 1034617 A 19660629 - FORD MOTOR CO
- [A] FR 2233118 A1 19750110 - CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO [US]
- [A] EP 0459486 A2 19911204 - NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]
- [A] DE 1259024 B 19680118 - FISCHER AG GEORG
- [A] WO 8504826 A1 19851107 - BUDERUS AG [DE]
- [A] GB 2269771 A 19940223 - NEMOTO MASARU [JP]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 130 (M - 808) 30 March 1989 (1989-03-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 12 (M - 186)<1157> 19 January 1983 (1983-01-19)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 267 (M - 516) 10 September 1986 (1986-09-10)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 95103388 A 19950309