Global patent index - EP 0730959 B1

EP 0730959 B1 2000-01-19 - Method of producing a reference model to be used for automatic quality control of images on paper

Title (en)

Method of producing a reference model to be used for automatic quality control of images on paper

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Referenzmodells für automatische Qualitätskontrolle von Bildern auf Papier

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'un modèle de référence destiné à être utilisé pour le contrôle automatique de la qualité d'impression d'une image sur du papier

Publication

EP 0730959 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96810121 A

Priority

IT MI950430 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0730959A1] The electronically-produced reference model is made by preparing a group of test sheets with complete images, printed by the same method and procedure as that used for the serial print run. The printed images are registered and the density values for the pixels making up the images are memorised. Each pixel is given a minimum value in the assembly of images in a group, and a model of the printed design is formed during the first printing phase. The process is repeated during subsequent printing phases, with the pixel density values (a10-a23) maintained at their required levels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); G01N 21/88 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G06T 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0730959 A1 19960911; EP 0730959 B1 20000119; AT 188916 T 20000215; AU 4585296 A 19960919; AU 692991 B2 19980618; CA 2171165 A1 19960908; CA 2171165 C 20070417; CN 1074996 C 20011121; CN 1138692 A 19961225; DE 69606206 D1 20000224; DE 69606206 T2 20000810; IT 1276010 B1 19971024; IT MI950430 A1 19960909; IT MI950430 D0 19950307; JP 2007168449 A 20070705; JP H08276569 A 19961022; KR 100362023 B1 20030509; RU 2161792 C2 20010110; US 5778088 A 19980707

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150304

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150304

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150304

2015-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69606206

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140304

2015-01-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Effective date: 20141223

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140410

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 188916

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140304

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140320

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110305

2012-06-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: HC

- Ref Document Number: 188916

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-02-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69606206

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: KBA-GIORI S.A., LAUSANNE, CH

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69606206

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: REBLE & KLOSE RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20111222

2011-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-01-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA

- Free Format Text: KBA-GIORI S.A.#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH) -TRANSFER TO- KBA-NOTASYS SA#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH)

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: BA-GIORI S.A.

- Free Format Text: KBA-GIORI S.A.#4, RUE DE LA PAIX#1003 LAUSANNE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- KBA-GIORI S.A.#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606206

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188916

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980831

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970201

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE