Global Patent Index - EP 0731046 B1

EP 0731046 B1 2000-04-26 - Device for synchronising sheet feeding

Title (en)

Device for synchronising sheet feeding

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Synchronisation der Zuführung von Bogen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour synchroniser l'alimentation de feuilles

Publication

EP 0731046 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103389 A

Priority

DE 19508041 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731046A2] The book-binding machine (7) has a sheet transfer device (11) located in front of it. This is formed by two transporter rollers (3), located above each other. It has variable conveying speed, so that it accelerates sheets, which lag relative to the binding machine, and delays sheets, which move too fast. The transfer device moves a sheet (1) to the binding machine at the machine working speed (V2), and receives sheets at the sheet feed speed (V1). The device has a sensor (10), to detect the passage of a front edge of a sheet. The binding machine has a synchro system (6). Acceleration and deceleration is determined by the signal differential between sensor and system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/34; B65H 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/06 (2006.01); B65H 5/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/062 (2013.01); B65H 5/34 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731046 A2 19960911; EP 0731046 A3 19970409; EP 0731046 B1 20000426; DE 19508041 A1 19960912; DE 19508041 C2 19990520; PT 731046 E 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-29 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20060814

2006-08-23 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-04-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MASCHINENBAU OPPENWEILER BINDER GMBH & CO

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-11-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT DE

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605015 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT PT

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980709

1997-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE IT PT

1996-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960906

1996-10-04 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: DR. ING. A. RACHELI & C.

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT PT