Global Patent Index - EP 0731051 B1

EP 0731051 B1 2001-05-23 - Device and method for damping vibrations on an elevator cage

Title (en)

Device and method for damping vibrations on an elevator cage

Title (de)

Einrichtung und Verfahren zur Schwingungsdämpfung an einer Aufzugskabine

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé d'atténuation des vibrations sur une cabine d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 0731051 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103184 A

Priority

CH 69495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731051A1] The device includes actuators equipped with linear motors (7). The stationary part (16) of the motor is attached to the frame of the lift car, and the moving part of the motor (17) is attached to guides (21). The moving part of the motor is a magnet which is attached by a tension-compression component to a roller lever serving as the guide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 7/04; B66B 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/02 (2006.01); B66B 7/04 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/027 (2013.01); B66B 7/042 (2013.01); B66B 7/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731051 A1 19960911; EP 0731051 B1 20010523; AT 201380 T 20010615; AU 4791996 A 19960919; AU 702382 B2 19990218; CA 2171376 A1 19960911; CA 2171376 C 20060613; CN 1050580 C 20000322; CN 1134392 A 19961030; DE 59606928 D1 20010628; HK 1011340 A1 20020215; JP 2008297127 A 20081211; JP 4493709 B2 20100630; JP H08245117 A 19960924; MY 115725 A 20030830; SG 54248 A1 19981116; US 5896949 A 19990427

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606928

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606928

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100311

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606928 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201380 T 20010615

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000517

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970217

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI