Global Patent Index - EP 0731161 B1

EP 0731161 B1 2002-09-04 - Detergent formulations, containing peracetylated or acylated carbohydrates as bleach activators or complexing agents.

Title (en)

Detergent formulations, containing peracetylated or acylated carbohydrates as bleach activators or complexing agents.

Title (de)

Waschmittelformulierungen, die peracetylierte bzw. acylierte Kohlenhydrate als Bleichmittelaktivatoren oder Komplexierungsmittel enthalten.

Title (fr)

Formulations de nettoyage contenant des hydrates de carbone peracétylés ou acylés comme activateurs de blanchiment ou agents complexants.

Publication

EP 0731161 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102954 A

Priority

DE 19507668 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731161A2] Use of acylated carbohydrates (A) is claimed as bleach activators or chelating agents in washing agents. The carbohydrate is saccharose, maltose, lactose, palatinose, trehalulose (sic), glucose and/or fructose. (A) contains 1 - 2 mono- or dicarboxylic acid (alkali salt) carboxyl gps. and the acyl gps. are 1-18C alkyl, tolyl and/or benzyl gps.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3912 (2013.01); C11D 3/221 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731161 A2 19960911; EP 0731161 A3 19970702; EP 0731161 B1 20020904; AT 223474 T 20020915; DE 19507668 A1 19960912; DE 19507668 C2 20000127; DK 0731161 T3 20030113; US 5968886 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160227

2016-03-23 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160227

2016-03-02 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160227

2016-02-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59609612

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-25 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-08 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-13 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609612 20021010

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223474 T 20020915

2002-03-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DETERGENT FORMULATIONS, CONTAINING PERACETYLATED OR ACYLATED CARBOHYDRATES AS BLEACH ACTIVATORS OR COMPLEXING AGENTS.

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991027

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970905

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL