Global patent index - EP 0731185 B1

EP 0731185 B1 2000-01-19 - Alumium-copper-magnesium alloy sheets with low residual stresses

Title (en)

Alumium-copper-magnesium alloy sheets with low residual stresses

Title (de)

Aluminium-Kupfer-Magnesiumbleche mit niedrigen Restspannungen

Title (fr)

Tôles en alliage Al-Cu-Mg à faible niveau de contraintes résiduelles

Publication

EP 0731185 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420077 A

Priority

FR 9503159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731185A1] An alloy comprises mainly Al with 3.5-5 wt.% Cu, 1.0-2.0% Mg, 0-0.25% Si, 0-0.025% Fe, 0-0.55% Mn and less than 0.25% total of other elements. The value of Mn-2Fe is between 0 and 0.2%. The level of recrystallisation in a piece of the alloy is more than 50% throughout, with no more than 35% variation between the surface and the centre. A bar of alloy which has been tempered and stretched, possibly annealed, then machined to half its thickness and placed on two spaced supports show a degree of bending given by F.E. is less than 0.14L<2>, pref. less than 0.04L<2>, where F is the bend in microns, E is the bar thickness in mm, and L the support spacing in mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731185 A1 19960911; EP 0731185 B1 20000119; DE 69606208 D1 20000224; DE 69606208 T2 20000621; FR 2731440 A1 19960913; FR 2731440 B1 19970418

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160306

2016-03-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160306

2015-10-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20150915

2015-10-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM ISSOIRE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20150915

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150317

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69606208

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69606208

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69606208

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69606208

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-06-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69606208

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CONSTELLIUM FRANCE, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20111123

2006-06-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-03-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PECHINEY RHENALU

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606208

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981229

1996-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961004

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB