Global Patent Index - EP 0731204 B1

EP 0731204 B1 2000-05-24 - A condensation laundry dryer with arrangements for collecting condensation water in a container

Title (en)

A condensation laundry dryer with arrangements for collecting condensation water in a container

Title (de)

Wäschetrockner mit Kondensationseinrichtung mit Kondensat-Sammelgefässvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Sèche-linge à condensation avec dispositif pour receuillir l'eau de condensation dans un conteneur

Publication

EP 0731204 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95202465 A

Priority

IT MI950453 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731204A1] A laundry dryer of the household type having a top-loading rotating drum and condensation water collecting arrangements, wherein an openable top cover (2) for loading the machine forms a pan accommodating a condensation water collecting tank (5) which is open at the top to receive said tank removably therein and extends downwards into a handhole slip (19) for loading said machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/24; D06F 39/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/14 (2006.01); D06F 58/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/14 (2013.01); D06F 58/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731204 A1 19960911; EP 0731204 B1 20000524; ES 2148423 T3 20001016; IT 1275910 B1 19971024; IT MI950453 A1 19960909; IT MI950453 D0 19950309

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090912

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090911

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080911

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080807

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148423 T3

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981029

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960919

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT