Global Patent Index - EP 0731228 B1

EP 0731228 B1 2003-06-04 - Angle bracket

Title (en)

Angle bracket

Title (de)

Auflagewinkel

Title (fr)

Equerre d'appui

Publication

EP 0731228 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103404 A

Priority

DE 19507766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731228A1] The angle-piece (74) is for the covers of front-wall-mounting components formed by C-section rails in sanitation equipment. It has a flat supporting surface, a mounting one at right angles to it, and a second supporting one (77) between them and at right angles to both. The mounting surface contains two or more fixing openings (78), whose centre distance is equal to the sum of half the widths (G) of two C-section rails (60). On one side at least, the edges of the first supporting surface (75) and the mounting one can be in a common plane, the second supporting surface being at these edges and containing the openings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/01 (2006.01); E03D 11/00 (2006.01); E03D 11/14 (2006.01); E04C 2/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/146 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731228 A1 19960911; EP 0731228 B1 20030604; AT 242369 T 20030615; CZ 9600658 A3 19960911; DE 19507766 A1 19960912; NO 960889 A 19960909; NO 960889 D0 19960305; PL 179060 B1 20000731; PL 313093 A1 19960916

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060305

2005-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050318

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DAL G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610482 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD & SIEDSMA AG

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL PT

2003-06-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020129

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAL GMBH & CO.KG

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAL GMBH & CO. GMBH

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970219

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI LU NL PT