Global Patent Index - EP 0731233 B1

EP 0731233 B1 2001-01-10 - Framework panel with improved properties

Title (en)

Framework panel with improved properties

Title (de)

Fachwerkplatte mit verbesserten Eigenschaften

Title (fr)

Dalle en treillis ayant des caractéristiques améliorées

Publication

EP 0731233 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102798 A

Priority

DE 19508185 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731233A1] A latticework panel made of thermoplastic material consists of 3 parallel chords a given distance apart (upper, middle and lower chords), with diagonal members between the chords acting as binders and spacers, arranged in zig-zag fashion between the upper and lower chords. With the exception of the outer edge members (10), the panel (1) has no vertical members between the opposite chords, but only diagonal members (5). Each diagonal (5) has a crossover point (9) with the middle chord (4), but the diagonals (5) do not cross each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/543 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731233 A1 19960911; EP 0731233 B1 20010110; DE 19508185 A1 19960912; DE 19508185 C2 19970116

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROHM G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-05-19 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100421

2010-01-01 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-01-01 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: EVONIK ROEHM GMBH

- Free text: ROEHM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG#KIRSCHENALLEE#64293 DARMSTADT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- EVONIK ROEHM GMBH#KIRSCHENALLEE#64293 DARMSTADT (DE)

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-02-15 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ROEHM GMBH & CO. KG

2001-07-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ROEHM GMBH & CO. KG

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606283 20010215

2001-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR LI NL

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990916

1999-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROEHM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG

1997-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGOMER GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG

1997-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961205

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR LI NL