Global Patent Index - EP 0731243 B1

EP 0731243 B1 2000-05-03 - Bolt with a disengageable rotor and car steering column lock with such a bolt

Title (en)

Bolt with a disengageable rotor and car steering column lock with such a bolt

Title (de)

Riegel mit entkuppelbarem Rotor und Automobillenkschloss mit einem solchen Riegel

Title (fr)

Verrou à rotor débrayable et antivol de direction de véhicule automobile équipé d'un tel verrou

Publication

EP 0731243 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96103461 A

Priority

FR 9502895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731243A1] The bolt (14) has a rotor (34) revolving in an intermediate stator (38) also rotating in the bolt fixed body. Pairs of locking pistons engage the rotor and intermediate stator (38) to make them rotate together in the absence of a key. The key comprises an indexing finger (68) which angularly indexes the intermediate stator relative to the fixed body which can move radially between indexing and retracted positions. The finger is returned by a spring (132) into its indexing position where it is received in a groove (50) in the fixed body. In the retracted position it is withdrawn radially inwards into a housing in the rotor, against a spring force. An outlet part (92) rotating in the bolt fixed body is connected to rotate with the rotor by a releasable drive (120). The drive release is caused by indexing the stator when it is in the retracted position. The release drive immobilises the outlet part in rotation relative to the bolt fixed body when they are in the released position under the action of the finger.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/04 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 4041134 C1 19920604

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731243 A1 19960911; EP 0731243 B1 20000503; DE 69608018 D1 20000608; DE 69608018 T2 20001214; ES 2148607 T3 20001016; FR 2731456 A1 19960913; FR 2731456 B1 19970404

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160306

2016-06-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160624

2016-03-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69608018

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE, CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 69608018

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69608018

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050305

2005-03-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050305

2004-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148607 T3

2000-07-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608018 20000608

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981218

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970220

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT