Global Patent Index - EP 0731247 B1

EP 0731247 B1 2000-04-19 - Device for securing a shutter windable about a shaft

Title (en)

Device for securing a shutter windable about a shaft

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Sicherung eines auf eine Welle wickelbaren Verschlusses

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité d'un volet enroulable autour d'un arbre

Publication

EP 0731247 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102496 A

Priority

  • DE 29504066 U
  • DE 29505244 U
  • DE 29519785 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731247A2] The device has at least two lockable and unlockable interacting securing rods (3.1,3.2) which are mounted between the shaft (2) and the roller shutter (1) which winds up on same. In the locked state the securing rods lock the lowered shutter against rising up. In the unlocked state the securing rods can be wound up onto the shaft. The number of securing rods can be such that in the locked state at least the area between the inlet into the side guide (1.1) of the shutter and shaft is bridged. The securing rods can be profiled and connected together so that in the locked state they are pushed in each other and in the unlocked state when extended from each other they are connected together by articulated joints.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/86; E06B 9/174

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/165 (2006.01); E06B 9/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/86 (2013.01); E06B 9/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731247 A2 19960911; EP 0731247 A3 19980114; EP 0731247 B1 20000419; AT 191956 T 20000515; ES 2144658 T3 20000616; PL 181410 B1 20010731; PL 313072 A1 19960916

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKENJOHANN JOHANN

- Effective date: 20050228

2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050221

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKENJOHANN JOHANN

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050221

2005-02-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050220

2005-02-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050220

2004-03-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040312

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040204

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040116

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144658 T3

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604980 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191956 T 20000515

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980730

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980610

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL