Global Patent Index - EP 0731252 B1

EP 0731252 B1 2003-06-25 - Boring ram for the destructive replacement of a buried pipe

Title (en)

Boring ram for the destructive replacement of a buried pipe

Title (de)

Rammbohrgerät zum zerstörenden Ersetzen erdverlegter Rohrleitungen

Title (fr)

Mouton de forage pour le remplacement par destruction d'une conduite enterrée

Publication

EP 0731252 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103364 A

Priority

DE 19508450 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731252A2] The drill has a conical point, a breaker head (6) fitted on the point, a pull cable engaging with the point, and a cable cover in the form of an elastic sleeve. The point has an axial opening (3) for a pull cable adaptor (11-13) and a transverse opening for the fastening pin (5) of the adaptor. The adaptor consists of a pull rod (11) with an eye (12) for the fastening pin and a lug on the rod free end protruding out of the head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 29/00; E21B 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 1/024 (2006.01); E21B 7/30 (2006.01); E21D 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731252 A2 19960911; EP 0731252 A3 19971119; EP 0731252 B1 20030625; DE 19508450 A1 19960912; DE 19508450 C2 19970313; JP 2727314 B2 19980311; JP H09184579 A 19970715; US 5876152 A 19990302

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120305

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120305

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-07-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610547 P 20030731

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRACTO-TECHNICK GMBH

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000519

1998-05-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980317

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI