Global Patent Index - EP 0731258 B1

EP 0731258 B1 2002-09-04 - Exhaust manifold

Title (en)

Exhaust manifold

Title (de)

Abgaskrümmer

Title (fr)

Collecteur d'échappement

Publication

EP 0731258 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102547 A

Priority

DE 19507439 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731258A1] The assembly consists of a flange (1) on which outlet pipes (4) are mounted. At least two of the pipes (4) are shaped so that they have semi-circular cross section and can together be mounted in a larger tube (6) of circular cross section. This larger tube and a third outlet pipe (4) are shaped so that they can be joined and mounted in a large outlet pipe (7). The outlet pipe is connected to the same flange (1) to which the outlet pipes (4) are connected, or to a separate flange. The outlet pipe of the engine is connected to this flanges (1). The whole assembly is enclosed in a cover (19) which is also mounted on the flange (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/10 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/102 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19507439 A1 19960905; AT 223556 T 20020915; EP 0731258 A1 19960911; EP 0731258 B1 20020904; ES 2178683 T3 20030101

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59609613

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100222

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110221

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110221

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100222

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100221

2011-03-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100221

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRIEDRICH *BOYSEN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178683 T3

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609613 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223556 T 20020915

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRIEDRICH BOYSEN GMBH & CO. KG

1998-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980921

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970226

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE