Global Patent Index - EP 0731260 B1

EP 0731260 B1 2000-06-07 - Control method for a cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Control method for a cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Regelung eines Kühlkreislaufes eines Verbrennungskraftmotors

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d'un circuit de refroidissement d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0731260 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96100636 A

Priority

DE 19508104 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731260A1] The regulation system has a control device (5) for adjusting the revs of the coolant circulation pump (3) and the fan (4) directing air through the radiator, in dependence on the required temp of the engine coolant. The heating-up phase for the engine is shortened by reducing the output of the circulation pump and the fan after starting the engine until the engine coolant reaches a given temp threshold, above which the regulation for maintaining the required coolant temp is brought into operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 7/04 (2006.01); F01P 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 7/044 (2013.01); F01P 7/164 (2013.01); F01P 7/167 (2013.01); F01P 2023/08 (2013.01); F01P 2025/30 (2013.01); F01P 2025/32 (2013.01); F01P 2025/62 (2013.01); F01P 2025/64 (2013.01); F01P 2025/66 (2013.01); F01P 2031/30 (2013.01); F01P 2037/02 (2013.01); F01P 2060/04 (2013.01); F01P 2060/045 (2013.01); F01P 2060/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731260 A1 19960911; EP 0731260 B1 20000607; DE 19508104 A1 19960912; DE 19508104 C2 20000525; ES 2148598 T3 20001016; US 5724924 A 19980310

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605375

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050118

2005-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050118

2004-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040129

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148598 T3

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605375 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990203

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970311

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB