Global Patent Index - EP 0731328 B1

EP 0731328 B1 2001-04-25 - Heat exchanger with U-tubes, provided with a damping and anti- blowout device for securing tubes

Title (en)

Heat exchanger with U-tubes, provided with a damping and anti- blowout device for securing tubes

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher mit U-Röhren, mit einer Anti-Auftrieb- und schwingungsneutralisierender Rohrhalterungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur, à tubes en U, équipé d'un dispositif de calage des tubes, antivibratoire et anti-envol

Publication

EP 0731328 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400463 A

Priority

FR 9502745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731328A1] The heat exchanger comprises a bundle of tubes (10) bent in a U shape, with a curved section between two straight legs. The tubes are arranged regularly, with all the legs parallel. A bundle envelope (4) surrounds the tube bundle and a number of antivibration bars (15) clamp between adjacent curved tube sections, forming an external bundle end. Connections (20) between these external bar ends, with a support (40), fixed to the bundle envelope, prevent movement. Thus only limited movement of the anti vibration bars and fixings is permitted on a direction parallel to the tube legs. The connections may each comprise a notched (21a) comb (21), receiving the bar ends, with a comb cover (22) and fixings (23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/013; F22B 37/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/16 (2006.01); F22B 37/20 (2006.01); F28D 1/06 (2006.01); F28D 7/06 (2006.01); F28F 9/013 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/06 (2013.01); F22B 37/206 (2013.01); F28F 9/0132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731328 A1 19960911; EP 0731328 B1 20010425; CN 1099020 C 20030115; CN 1160183 A 19970924; DE 69612581 D1 20010531; DE 69612581 T2 20010906; EP 1061320 A2 20001220; EP 1061320 A3 20010117; FR 2731508 A1 19960913; FR 2731508 B1 19970509; JP 2006105589 A 20060420; JP 3773980 B2 20060510; JP 3923991 B2 20070606; JP H08261404 A 19961011; KR 100397689 B1 20031231; TW 307876 B 19970611; US 5692557 A 19971202

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160304

2016-03-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160304

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150316

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69612581

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612581 20010531

2001-05-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FRAMATOME ANP

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB SE

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAMATOME

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990312

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970210

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB SE