Global Patent Index - EP 0731389 B1

EP 0731389 B1 2000-08-16 - Toner and non-contact developing method using the same

Title (en)

Toner and non-contact developing method using the same

Title (de)

Toner und es benutzendes Entwicklungsverfahren vom "Ohne Kontakt"-Typ

Title (fr)

Révélateur et méthode de développement par non-contact l'utilisant

Publication

EP 0731389 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96301618 A

Priority

JP 4853695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731389A1] A toner which can exhibit 5 nN or less of inter-particle force calculated by the following equation (1) when the toner is laminated and carried on a toner carrier: <MATH> where Fv is an inter-particle force, q . E is a Coulomb force calculated by the following equation: <MATH> where Fi is an image-force calculated by the following equation (3): <MATH> where q is a quantity of charge ÄCÜ of the toner particle to be developed, E is an electric field strength ÄV/mÜ acting on the toner layer, Q/M is a toner charge-to-mass ratio ÄmC/gÜ, W1 is an amount of toner separated by development among the toner laminated and carried on the toner carrier, epsilon o is a vacuum dielectric constant ÄC/(V.m)Ü, epsilon T is an apparent specific dielectric constant ÄC/(V.m)Ü of the toner layer, d is an average particle size Ä mu mÜ of the toner, delta is a true density Äg/cm<3>Ü of the toner, g is a gap ÄmmÜ between the outermost surface of the toner on the toner carrier and the electrostatic latent image holder, dt1 is a thickness Ä mu mÜ of the toner layer on the toner carrier, Vb is a development bias voltage ÄVÜ and P is a toner packing rate. The present invention provides a toner and a non-contact developing method using the same which realize stable flying-development by suppressing to 5 nN or less the inter-particle force of the toner other than the image-force acting on the toner laminated and carried on the toner carrier. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/08 (2006.01); G03G 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 13/08 (2013.01); G03G 9/0819 (2013.01); G03G 9/0821 (2013.01); G03G 9/0823 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0619 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731389 A1 19960911; EP 0731389 B1 20000816; DE 69609749 D1 20000921; DE 69609749 T2 20010412

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130308

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69609749

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130308

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120404

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120307

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609749

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990121

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970121

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB