Global Patent Index - EP 0731484 B1

EP 0731484 B1 2001-05-30 - Relay, in particular for motor vehicle technique

Title (en)

Relay, in particular for motor vehicle technique

Title (de)

Relais, insbesondere für die KFZ-Technik

Title (fr)

Relais, en particulier pour la technique du véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0731484 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101893 A

Priority

DE 19508494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731484A2] The relay has a coil system (3) with a yoke (11) and a magnetic armature (15), used to operate at least one relay contact having a stationary contact and a contact spring. The contact spring is supported by a stationary carrier and coupled to the armature, or a second contact spring of a further relay contact which is coupled to the armature, via a non-conductive coupling element (61).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/54; H01H 50/04; H01H 50/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/64 (2006.01); H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/54 (2006.01); H01H 50/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/54 (2013.01); H01H 50/041 (2013.01); H01H 50/60 (2013.01); H01H 1/5822 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731484 A2 19960911; EP 0731484 A3 19970709; EP 0731484 B1 20010530; CZ 283125 B6 19980114; CZ 9600709 A3 19970813; DE 19508494 A1 19960912; DE 19508494 C2 19980820; ES 2158157 T3 20010901

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606973

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606973

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100209

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100209

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100209

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090106

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030210

2003-02-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158157 T3

2001-08-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: IPSER S.R.L.

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606973 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRW AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS & COMPONENTS GMBH & CO.

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990216

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970721

1997-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT