Global Patent Index - EP 0731532 B1

EP 0731532 B1 2000-07-12 - Connector for airbag igniter

Title (en)

Connector for airbag igniter

Title (de)

Verbinder für Airbag-Zünder

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour allumeur d'un airbag

Publication

EP 0731532 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96103400 A

Priority

US 40025195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731532A1] The connector comprises a plug (1) with socket contacts (2) with a wire connection side and a side receiving contact pins (6) extending from a socket (8) located on the airbag igniter. The connector is "non-serviceable", i.e., once it is mated with the ignition, it can only be unmated by use of a special tool. A snap-on cover (9) assures retention of the cable (4), and a downwardly projecting element (40) engages an aperture (50) in the igniter socket (8) to permit 360 DEG positioning of the plug and the application of torque. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/627; H01R 13/639

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6395 (2013.01); H01R 13/6273 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731532 A1 19960911; EP 0731532 B1 20000712

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150317

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Effective date: 20140715

2011-07-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-04-15 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2011-04-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2000-06-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR IT

1997-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970618

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970228

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR IT