Global patent index - EP 0731624 B1

EP 0731624 B1 2000-01-19 - Heating device for waterbeds

Title (en)

Heating device for waterbeds

Title (de)

Heizungsvorrichtung für Wasserbetten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chauffage pour lits à eau

Publication

EP 0731624 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103374 A

Priority

DE 19508315 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19508315C1] A heating unit for water bed, consists of electrical resistance conductors which are located between a bed frame and a safety film, and a temp. control. The unit comprises ceramic plates (13-18) with electrical conductors (23), which are glued to the bottom (11a) of a stiff metal plate (11) using an adhesive (19) with a high thermal conductivity. The plate is applied to a base-plate (12) of poor thermal conductivity, while leaving an air gap (33) for the ceramic plates. The base-plate pref. consists of a plastic, e.g. acryl nitrile-butadiene styrol copolymers, polyurethane, polyamide or a polyethylene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/32; H05B 3/14; H05B 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/04 (2006.01); A47C 27/08 (2006.01); H05B 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/081 (2013.01); A47C 21/048 (2013.01); A47C 27/085 (2013.01); H05B 3/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19508315 C1 19960509; AT 189095 T 20000215; CA 2171410 A1 19960910; EP 0731624 A2 19960911; EP 0731624 A3 19961211; EP 0731624 B1 20000119; NL 1002575 A1 19960911; NL 1002575 C2 19980407; US 5811760 A 19980922

INPADOC legal status

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140305

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 189095

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-10-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20141001

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: SBI DEVELOPMENT BV

- Free Format Text: SBI DEVELOPMENT BV#EXPEDITIEWEG 6F#7007 CM DOETINCHEM (NL) -TRANSFER TO- SBI DEVELOPMENT BV#EXPEDITIEWEG 6F#7007 CM DOETINCHEM (NL)

2004-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Owner name: SBI DEVELOPMENT BV

- Free Format Text: SBI DEVELOPMENT B.V.#HAITINKWEG 8#7021 KB ZELHEM (NL) -TRANSFER TO- SBI DEVELOPMENT BV#EXPEDITIEWEG6F#7007 CM DOETINCHEM (NL)

2003-02-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SBI DEVELOPMENT B.V.

2003-02-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: VONTANA INDUSTRIE GMBH & CO. KG

2003-02-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: VONTANA VERTRIEB GMBH & CO. KG

2002-08-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

- Owner name: VONTANA WASSERBETTEN GMBH TRANSFER- SBI DEVELOPMEN

2001-02-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Free Format Text: ERRATUM: PATENT NUMBER EP0731624 IN THE PATENTS DESIGNS JOURNAL NO. 5807 ON 30 AUGUST 2000 A NOTICEWAS PUBLISHED ANNOUNCING THAT REINSTATEMENT OF THE PATENT WAS BEING CONSIDERED UNDER RULE 100. THAT NOTICE IS CANCELLED AND THE PATENT REMAINS VOID.

2001-02-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VONTANA WASSERBETTEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-08-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Free Format Text: ERRATUM: PATENT NUMBER EP0731624 THIS PATENT WAS ADVERTISED IN THE PATENTS DESIGNS JOURNAL NO. 5801ON 19 JULY 2000 AS BEING VOID. REINSTATEMENT OF THE PATENT UNDER RULE 100 OS BEING CONSIDERED.

2000-07-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-06-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-03-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000305

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189095

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-10-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

1999-09-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990407

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970407

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE