Global Patent Index - EP 0731895 B1

EP 0731895 B1 2000-03-08 - A STOKER FOR BURNING SOLID FUEL

Title (en)

A STOKER FOR BURNING SOLID FUEL

Title (de)

BESCHICKUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FESTE BRENNSTOFFE

Title (fr)

CHARGEUR POUR LE BRULAGE DE COMBUSTIBLE SOLIDE

Publication

EP 0731895 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95905282 A

Priority

  • SE 9401252 W
  • SE 9304289 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9517627A1] A stoker for burning solid fuel, comprising a grate (14) which is connected to a fan (21) for supply of combustion air, and feeding means (11, 12) for controlled feeding of fuel from a reservoir (15, 17) to the grate (14). The reservoir on one hand comprises a primary container (15) located at the feeding means (11, 12) containing a smaller volume of the fuel, and on the other a secondary container (17) which is connected to the primary container and is located at a distance from said primary container and having a main volume of the fuel. The primary container comprises detector means (20a) for controlling replenishment of fuel from the secondary container to the primary container. An air distribution chamber (20b) is located between the grate (14) and the primary container (15), which chamber is supplied with air via the fan (21) distributing air to the grate bowl (14) via a primary air pipe (22), and to the upper side of the grate via a secondary air outlet (23). An outer ring (26) is rotatably journalled upon the upper edge of the grate bowl, and is provided with gear segments to rotate the ring (26) in order to avoid accumulation of cinders at the opening of the grate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23K 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23B 3/00 (2013.01); F23K 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9517627 A1 19950629; AT 190389 T 20000315; AU 1395195 A 19950710; DE 69423366 D1 20000413; DE 69423366 T2 20000727; DK 0731895 T3 20000814; EP 0731895 A1 19960918; EP 0731895 B1 20000308; PL 181372 B1 20010731; SE 502033 C2 19950724; SE 9304289 D0 19931223; SE 9304289 L 19950624

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101223

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101223

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100104

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-09 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-12-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423366 20000413

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO GLP S.R.L.

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IE IT LI NL

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190389 T 20000315

1999-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAHLINS ECOTEC AB

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: E.K. TEKNIK UTVECKLING AB

1998-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980317

1996-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960715

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IE IT LI NL