Global Patent Index - EP 0731899 B1

EP 0731899 B1 2000-03-29 - A HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (en)

A HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 0731899 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95902256 A

Priority

  • IE 9400057 W
  • IE 930900 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9514895A1] A condensing boiler (1) comprises a heat exchanger (5) having a cylindrical first heat exchange wall (6) surrounded by an outer water chamber (10). A plug (17) extends into the first heat exchange wall (6) and forms a combustion chamber (22) and an annular downwardly extending flue gas passageway (23) for accommodating flue gases from the combustion chamber (22). The plug (17) comprises an outer shell (18) which forms a second heat exchange wall (19) and an inner cylindrical shell (35) which forms with the outer shell (18) an inner water chamber (36). A connecting pipe (46) connects the inner water chamber (36) to the outer water chamber (10) so that water flows in series through the inner water chamber (36) and the outer water chamber (10) from a return water inlet (42) in the inner water chamber (36) to a flow water outlet (16) from the outer water chamber (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/28; F24H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/28 (2006.01); F24H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/0026 (2013.01); F24H 1/282 (2013.01); F24H 9/0015 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9514895 A1 19950601; AT 191272 T 20000415; AU 1118395 A 19950613; DE 69423779 D1 20000504; EP 0731899 A1 19960918; EP 0731899 B1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-11-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-11-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041125

2003-11-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-11 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20031111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001125

2000-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-06-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423779 20000504

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19960606;SI PAYMENT 19960606

2000-03-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2000-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191272 T 20000415

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOOD, JOHN

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MONAGHAN, PAUL

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VAUGHAN, MICHAEL

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AHERN, JOHN, MICHAEL

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COSTELLOE, CIARAN, JOHN

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CONNEELY, THOMAS

1998-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971209

1996-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960610

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960606;SI PAYMENT 960606

1996-09-18 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960606;SI PAYMENT 960606