Global Patent Index - EP 0731900 B1

EP 0731900 B1 2000-01-26 - METHOD AND PLANT FOR LIQUEFYING NATURAL GAS

Title (en)

METHOD AND PLANT FOR LIQUEFYING NATURAL GAS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERDGASVERFLÜSSIGUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE LIQUEFACTION DU GAZ NATUREL

Publication

EP 0731900 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95933471 A

Priority

  • FR 9501281 W
  • FR 9412046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5701761A] PCT No. PCT/FR95/01281 Sec. 371 Date Jun. 3, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Jun. 3, 1996 PCT Filed Oct. 3, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO96/11370 PCT Pub. Date Apr. 18, 1996A pressurized natural gas is liquefied through at least one cooling cycle, in which a mixture of cooling fluids is used, comprising at least the following steps: a) at least some of the said cooling mixture is condensed by compression and cooling, for example, using an external cooling fluid to obtain at least one vapor fraction and one liquid fraction, b) at least some of each of the vapor and liquid fractions is expanded separately to obtain a light fluid M1 comprising mostly a vapor phase and a heavy fluid M2 comprising mostly a liquid phase, c) the fluids M1 and M2 are at least partially mixed to obtain a low-temperature mixture, and d) the natural gas is liquified and undercooled under pressure by a process of heat exchange with the low-temperature mixture produced during step c).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 1/02; F25J 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 1/00 (2006.01); C10L 3/06 (2006.01); C10L 10/14 (2006.01); F25J 1/02 (2006.01); F25J 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/0257 (2013.01); F25J 1/0022 (2013.01); F25J 1/004 (2013.01); F25J 1/0042 (2013.01); F25J 1/005 (2013.01); F25J 1/0052 (2013.01); F25J 1/0055 (2013.01); F25J 1/0092 (2013.01); F25J 1/0212 (2013.01); F25J 1/0214 (2013.01); F25J 1/0264 (2013.01); F25J 3/0209 (2013.01); F25J 3/0233 (2013.01); F25J 2200/02 (2013.01); F25J 2200/70 (2013.01); F25J 2215/04 (2013.01); F25J 2220/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5701761 A 19971230; AU 3611895 A 19960502; AU 701090 B2 19990121; EP 0731900 A1 19960918; EP 0731900 B1 20000126; FR 2725503 A1 19960412; FR 2725503 B1 19961227; JP 3965444 B2 20070829; JP H09506392 A 19970624; NO 307231 B1 20000228; NO 962314 A 19960802; NO 962314 D0 19960604; WO 9611370 A1 19960418

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151002

2015-10-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20151002

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-12-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE

1999-10-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980923

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961018

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT