Global patent index - EP 0732066 B1

EP 0732066 B1 2000-11-29 - Boot binding ski combination for use in cross-country skiing

Title (en)

Boot binding ski combination for use in cross-country skiing

Title (de)

Schuh-Bindung-Schi-Kombination zur Ausübung des Schilanglaufs

Title (fr)

Ensemble chaussure-fixation-ski pour la pratique du ski de fond

Publication

EP 0732066 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420078 A

Priority

FR 9503169 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732066A1] The ski shoe attachment comprises a fixing located on top of the ski for attaching the boot to the ski. The boot comprises a sole having at the front means for attaching to the fixing. The boot back (6) surrounding the heel and extends towards the foot front and forms with the sole a concave clearance located at the plantar arch. There is a support in the concave clearance intended, during an impulse, to be supported on the zone of the ski perpendicular to the clearance. This avoids lateral deformation of the back at the clearance. The support is constituted by several ribs (20) which are attached to the boot in the concave clearance. These ribs extend laterally and are perpendicular to the top part of the clearance and are supported on the ski by their lower edges. The ski boot attachment prevents lateral flexing of the boot towards the inside during impulses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A43B 13/14; A63C 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 13/14 (2006.01); A63C 9/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/20 (2013.01); A43B 5/0411 (2013.01); A43B 5/0413 (2013.01); A43B 5/0421 (2013.01); A43B 13/14 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

WO 9409660 A1 19940511 - ROSSIGNOL SA [FR], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0732066 A1 19960918; EP 0732066 B1 20001129; DE 69611047 D1 20010104; DE 69611047 T2 20010405; FR 2731596 A1 19960920; FR 2731596 B1 19970418

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050311

2004-03-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040305

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-01-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611047

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-04

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI SE

1997-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971016

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960921

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI SE