Global Patent Index - EP 0732069 B1

EP 0732069 B1 2001-12-12 - Drawer

Title (en)

Drawer

Title (de)

Schublade

Title (fr)

Tiroir

Publication

EP 0732069 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102881 A

Priority

  • DE 29503692 U
  • DE 29503693 U
  • DE 29503695 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732069A2] The front panel is fixed by a movable slide (7) which engages with a removable holder on the drawer. The slide interacts with a tension device (8) by means of which the fitted and pre-adjusted front panel can be pressed against the end side of the side rail of the drawer. The tension device can be formed by an elbow joint lever (11,12) which in the released state allows restricted freedom for adjusting the panel and in the tensioned state covers the opening area (15) in the side wall. The elbow lever has in the area of its longitudinal extension a fixing (18) for articulated connection with the slide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/00; A47B 88/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/00 (2006.01); A47B 88/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/00 (2013.01); A47B 88/90 (2017.01); A47B 88/906 (2017.01); A47B 88/956 (2017.01); A47B 2088/951 (2017.01)

Citation (examination)

US 4458965 A 19840710 - OHLENDORF HEINZ [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0732069 A2 19960918; EP 0732069 A3 19980729; EP 0732069 B1 20011212; AT 210399 T 20011215

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59608404

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110318

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ELCO KUNSTSTOFFE A. ELGES G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608404 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210399 T 20011215

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000803

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELCO KUNSTSTOFFE A. ELGES GMBH

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990107

1998-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE