Global patent index - EP 0732070 B1

EP 0732070 B1 2000-05-24 - A bed, in particular nursing bed

Title (en)

A bed, in particular nursing bed

Title (de)

Bett, insbesondere Pflegebett

Title (fr)

Lit, notamment lit de soins

Publication

EP 0732070 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96200528 A

Priority

NL 9500505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732070A1] The invention relates to a bed, in particular nursing bed, provided with a bed frame (1), that is supported, in a cantilever fashion, by a supporting and guiding device (6) positioned on one side of said frame (1), wherein said frame is vertically adjustable by means of a drive means (13,13A). According to the invention said frame (1) has, at its supported side (1A), a supporting lever (2) extending from the plane of the said frame (1), said lever (2) being, adjacent its upper end (3), pivotally attached to a bracket (4A) that is mounted for up and down movements along said supporting and guiding device (6), while bearing adjacent its lower end (14) onto a guiding surface (15A) that changes, at a location where a downward bed frame movement passes beyond a (lower) operative horizontal position, from a vertical plane into a plane that slopes towards the non supported side of said frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 17/38; A47C 17/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/38 (2006.01); A47C 17/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/38 (2013.01); A47C 17/84 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0732070 A1 19960918; EP 0732070 B1 20000524; DE 69608486 D1 20000629; NL 192560 B 19970602; NL 192560 C 19971003; NL 9500505 A 19961001

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020901

2001-10-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-10-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608486

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-05-24 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990715

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970317

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL