Global Patent Index - EP 0732072 B1

EP 0732072 B1 2000-09-13 - Lying furniture with pendulous frame

Title (en)

Lying furniture with pendulous frame

Title (de)

Liegemöbel mit Pendelrahmen

Title (fr)

Meuble de couchage avec cadre de balancement

Publication

EP 0732072 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810155 A

Priority

CH 75295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732072A2] The bed has a pendulum frame (1) which is suspended from the locally fixed frame by at least three suspension elements (7,8,9,10), of which at least two are formed as V-shaped pairs with two bendable suspension members. Each pair has two end points fixed on the frame and two movably mounted end points each defining a triangular trapeze. The suspension pairs (7,7',8,8',9,9',10.10') are each fixed by their movably mounted end points on a supporting element (2,3) which supports the pendulum frame (1) and can move swinging in various horizontal directions. The supporting element can have a flat shape and being aligned orthogonally relative to a longitudinal axis of the bed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 19/02; A47C 3/025

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0732072 A2 19960918; EP 0732072 A3 19961002; EP 0732072 B1 20000913; AT 196228 T 20000915; DE 59605855 D1 20001019

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THOMAS BETEILIGUNGS- UND VERMOGENS G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THOMAS BETEILIGUNGS- UND VERMOGENS G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2004-05-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040527

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040405

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605855 20001019

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI

2000-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196228 T 20000915

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981202

1997-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMAS BETEILIGUNGS- UND VERMOEGENS GMBH & CO. KG

1997-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEGEN, HUGO

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961031

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI