Global Patent Index - EP 0732073 B1

EP 0732073 B1 2001-01-10 - A mattress or the like impervious to water, a method to make a mattress impervious to water, and a method for washing such mattress

Title (en)

A mattress or the like impervious to water, a method to make a mattress impervious to water, and a method for washing such mattress

Title (de)

Wasserdichte Matratze oder dergleichen, Verfahren zum Wasserdichtmachen einer Matratze, und Verfahren zum Waschen derselben

Title (fr)

Matelas imperméable ou analogue, procédé pour imperméabiliser un matelas, et procédé pour son lavage

Publication

EP 0732073 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96200671 A

Priority

NL 9500497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732073A1] The cover (10) of the mattress is made of a material to allow through vapour but not fluid. The cover has a filling opening (12) which is sealed tight against spray water. The filling opening can be covered by a cover strip (110) of waterproof material attached to the cover (10). An air channel (120) connects the inside of the mattress (100) to the atmosphere. The cover strip is fixed over a part of its circumferential edge to the cover (10) so that the area of strip adhering to the cover has a U-shape running round the filling opening whilst a central area of the strip corresponding to the filling opening as well as a marginal part of the strip adjoining the central area are free of the cover or rest freely against same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 21/06; A47C 27/00; A47C 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/06 (2006.01); A47C 27/00 (2006.01); A47C 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/006 (2013.01); A47C 27/002 (2013.01); A47C 27/003 (2013.01); A47C 31/105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0732073 A1 19960918; EP 0732073 B1 20010110; DE 59606284 D1 20010215; NL 9500497 A 19961001

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RECTICEL NEDERLAND B.V.

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080410

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-04-01 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050401

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606284 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR LU NL

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990408

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961122

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR LU NL