Global Patent Index - EP 0732180 B1

EP 0732180 B1 2000-07-19 - Method for manufacturing thin boards, especially parqueting blocks

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing thin boards, especially parqueting blocks

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von dünnen Brettern, insbesondere Parkettlamellen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour tranches des planches minces, en particulier des lamelles de parquet

Publication

EP 0732180 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103619 A

Priority

DE 19509653 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19509653C1] The method uses a series of cutting devices, which repeatedly cut thin strips from squared timber. The thickness of the thin strips cut by each individual cutting device (1) is determined separately.The actual detected value is compared to a reference value for the strips cut by this device. The variation generates a signal, which is used to correct the blade setting for subsequent cutting. The actual thickness of a strip is calculated as a differential of the thickness of the remaining timber (5) before and after cutting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27L 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

JP H05131401 A 19930528 - MARUNAKA TEKKOSHO INC

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19509653 C1 19960523; AT 194791 T 20000815; CA 2171508 A1 19960918; EP 0732180 A2 19960918; EP 0732180 A3 19970115; EP 0732180 B1 20000719; JP H0985712 A 19970331

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-03-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060308

2005-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605614 20000824

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI SE

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194791 T 20000815

1999-04-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI SE

1998-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971219

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970225

1997-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI SE