EP 0732194 A1 19960918 - Method and apparatus for measuring and regulating the position of the slide in a high-speed cutting press
Title (en)
Method and apparatus for measuring and regulating the position of the slide in a high-speed cutting press
Title (de)
Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung und Regelung der Höhenstellung des Stössels einer schnellaufenden Schnittpresse
Title (fr)
Procédé et dispositif de mesure et de réglage de la position du coulisseau d'une presse à découper à grande vitesse
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 95103915 A 19950317
Abstract (en)
A high speed press has an upper plant Ä2Ü to which is fixed the top tool Ä3Ü of a die-set and is moved by a motor with a transmission Ä9Ü. Attached the platen is a magnetically coded rod Ä7Ü that consists of alternating segments of magnets that alternate in polarity. Mounted on a fixed support Ä17Ü is a detector head Ä12Ü. As the rod moves relative to the detector ac voltage pulses are induced in a coil within an electronic control unit Ä13Ü. Motor motion is monitored by a position transducer. The distance moved is continuously compared with a reference value to control the lower dead point of the tool movement.
Abstract (de)
Zur Steuerung der unteren Totpunktstellung des Stössels (2) wird die Ist-Stellung des Stössels (2) in der unteren oder oberen Totpunktstellung ermittelt und mit einem festgelegten Sollwert der unteren Totpunktstellung verglichen und dann die notwendige Aenderung der Höhenstellung des Stössels (2) durchgeführt. Ein magnetisch kodierter Massstab (7) ist mit dem Stössel (2) fest verbunden. Dieser Massstab (7) wirkt mit einem feststehenden Detektorkopf (12) zusammen. Die vom Detektorkopf (12) ausgehenden Messwert-Signale werden einer Steuereinheit (13) zugeführt, die die Höhenstellung des Stössels (2) ändert. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B30B 15/00 (2006.01); B30B 15/06 (2006.01); B30B 15/14 (2006.01); B30B 15/26 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B30B 15/0041 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [E] EP 0649733 A1 19950426 - AIDA ENG LTD [JP]
- [X] EP 0554501 A1 19930811 - AIDA ENG LTD [JP]
- [XA] DE 3439459 A1 19850711 - FUKUI MACHINERY CO [JP]
- [A] EP 0316519 A1 19890524 - S & S ELEKTRONIK GERATEBAU GMB [DE]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 399 (M - 1017) 29 August 1990 (1990-08-29)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 130 (M - 808) 30 March 1989 (1989-03-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 263 (M - 342) 4 December 1984 (1984-12-04)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0732194 A1 19960918; EP 0732194 B1 20000216; AT E189790 T1 20000315; DE 59507818 D1 20000323; JP H08309598 A 19961126; SG 38894 A1 19970417
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 95103915 A 19950317; AT 95103915 T 19950317; DE 59507818 T 19950317; JP 2661396 A 19960214; SG 1995002088 A 19951211