Global Patent Index - EP 0732194 B1

EP 0732194 B1 2000-02-16 - Method and apparatus for measuring and regulating the position of the slide in a high-speed cutting press

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for measuring and regulating the position of the slide in a high-speed cutting press

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung und Regelung der Höhenstellung des Stössels einer schnellaufenden Schnittpresse

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de mesure et de réglage de la position du coulisseau d'une presse à découper à grande vitesse

Publication

EP 0732194 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95103915 A

Priority

EP 95103915 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732194A1] A high speed press has an upper plant Ä2Ü to which is fixed the top tool Ä3Ü of a die-set and is moved by a motor with a transmission Ä9Ü. Attached the platen is a magnetically coded rod Ä7Ü that consists of alternating segments of magnets that alternate in polarity. Mounted on a fixed support Ä17Ü is a detector head Ä12Ü. As the rod moves relative to the detector ac voltage pulses are induced in a coil within an electronic control unit Ä13Ü. Motor motion is monitored by a position transducer. The distance moved is continuously compared with a reference value to control the lower dead point of the tool movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/00 (2006.01); B30B 15/06 (2006.01); B30B 15/14 (2006.01); B30B 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/0041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0732194 A1 19960918; EP 0732194 B1 20000216; AT 189790 T 20000315; DE 59507818 D1 20000323; JP H08309598 A 19961126; SG 38894 A1 19970417

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150316

2015-04-08 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150316

2015-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-03-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59507818

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140205

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130317

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 189790 T

- Effective date: 20130317

2013-10-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BRUDERER AG

- Free text: BRUDERER AG#EGNACHER STRASSE 44#CH-9320 FRASNACHT (CH) -TRANSFER TO- BRUDERER AG#EGNACHER STRASSE 44#CH-9320 FRASNACHT (CH)

2002-09-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2002-07-03 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HAULICK & ROOS GMBH STANZ- UND UMFORMTECHNIK

2001-01-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HAULICK & ROOS GMBH STANZ- UND UMFORMTECHNIK

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507818 20000323

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189790 T 20000315

2000-01-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990430

1996-12-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1996-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961004

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1996-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT;SI

1996-09-18 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT;SI