Global patent index - EP 0732268 B1

EP 0732268 B1 2000-02-02 - Folding box particullarly for storing and display of goods

Title (en)

Folding box particullarly for storing and display of goods

Title (de)

Faltschachtel, insbes. zur Aufbewahrung und Präsentation von Waren

Title (fr)

Boîte pliante, notamment pour la conservation et la présentation de marchandises

Publication

EP 0732268 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95114922 A

Priority

DE 29504226 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732268A1] The lower box part (1) consists of base and top sections (5,6), connected via front and rear side walls (7). The top section has circumferential edge ledges (9), with two parallel frame ledges (11) connected to two opposite ledges. Frame and edge ledges, and side walls, form a first pair of parallel frame sides, one of which engages on the inside of the base. The edges of the base at right angles to the side walls, are connected to four parallel frame ledges (13,14,15), form a second pair of parallel frame sides, and enclose the parallel upper edge of the top section. The outermost frame ledge forming the free end, engages on the inside in the base section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/20; B65D 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/20 (2006.01); B65D 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/248 (2013.01); B65D 5/2004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29504226 U1 19950504; EP 0732268 A1 19960918; EP 0732268 B1 20000202

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59507744

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121008

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120918

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CD CARTONDRUCK GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59507744

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120829

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59507744

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DIPL.-ING. HANS MUELLER, DR.-IN, DE

- Effective date: 20120829

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59507744

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DR.-ING. GERHARD CLEMENS, DR. R, DE

- Effective date: 20120829

2012-08-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59507744

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DIPL.-ING. HANS MUELLER, DR.-IN, DE

2003-11-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507744

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

1997-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970730

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961213

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB