Global Patent Index - EP 0732452 B1

EP 0732452 B1 2000-01-05 - Process and apparatus for stabilising light soils with insufficient bearing strength

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for stabilising light soils with insufficient bearing strength

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Stabilisierung van bindigen Böden mit ungenügender Tragfähigkeit

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour stabiliser les sols meubles de portance insuffisante

Publication

EP 0732452 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103299 A

Priority

  • DE 19509054 A
  • DE 19509053 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732452A1] The stamp (14) is set in rotation by a rotary drive (13) and is pressed into the ground along a linear guide (3), fitted on a frame (2) of the device, by a positioning drive (1). At the free end (17) of the stamp is an upwardly widening penetration head (18). The penetration head has at least one through-passage (20) which connects the space on the conveyor worm with the space (43) beneath the penetration head. The penetration head is rotation-symmetrically formed and at its widest point has a greater dia. (D1) than the conveyor worm (16). The penetration head is formed by a reinforced end of the conveyor worm, which in the area of its free end is provided with at least two spirals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0732452 A1 19960918; EP 0732452 B1 20000105; AT 188528 T 20000115; JP 3258227 B2 20020218; JP H08291517 A 19961105

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 188528 T

- Effective date: 20160304

2016-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-03-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604074

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-12-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050607

2005-10-05 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050607

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: IST INTERNATIONALE SPEZIALTIEFBAU GMBH

2003-10-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: IST INTERNATIONALE SPEZIALTIEFBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20001005

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: EBC BAUCONSULT GMBH

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EBC BAUCONSULT GMBH

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604074 20000210

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188528 T 20000115

1999-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAUER SPEZIALTIEFBAU GMBH

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980914

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961107

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL