Global Patent Index - EP 0732463 B1

EP 0732463 B1 2001-05-16 - Balustrade

Title (en)

Balustrade

Title (de)

Treppengeländer

Title (fr)

Balustrade

Publication

EP 0732463 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101481 A

Priority

DE 29503265 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732463A2] The banisters have the gap between the hand rail (12) and the step (20) covered in part by a panel (22). Openings are provided in the panel to allow bolts (38) to be connected to upper and lower retainers (16,18). The retainers are releasably attached to connecting pieces (28,30) fixed to the hand rail and to the steps. The panel has the shape of a parallelogram whose side edges run in parallel with the hand rail and with the newel post (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/1851 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI LU

EPO simple patent family

DE 29503265 U1 19950614; AT 201248 T 20010615; EP 0732463 A2 19960918; EP 0732463 A3 19980422; EP 0732463 B1 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050202

2003-09-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030902

2002-12-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TREPPENMEISTER PARTNERGEMEINSCHAFT HOLZTREPPENHERS

2002-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020202

2002-02-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020202

2001-10-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2001-08-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606892 20010621

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI LU

2001-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201248 T 20010615

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000530

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981007

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI LU

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI LU