Global Patent Index - EP 0732478 B1

EP 0732478 B1 2000-06-07 - Manual sealing device

Title (en)

Manual sealing device

Title (de)

Handversiegelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour cacheter à la main

Publication

EP 0732478 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96890038 A

Priority

AT 47895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732478A2] The retainer involves a first collar arm (1,11) rotatable around a vertical axis, at the free end (10) of which is a boom (2), which at its free end supports the sealing nozzle (3). The boom is both pivotable around a vertical axis (12) and an horizontal axis and in the sense of a pivoting of its free end is force-loaded upwards. At the free end of the collar arm a bearer is pivotably located around the vertical axis, on which the boom is pivotably located around the horizontal axis. The bearer in cross-section is U-shaped and its rib is arranged above the boom. On the boom an arm is rigidly fixed and the boom is force-loaded by a pneumatic cylinder (19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/66; E06B 3/673

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/06 (2006.01); B05C 17/00 (2006.01); E06B 3/66 (2006.01); E06B 3/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/061 (2013.01); B05C 17/00 (2013.01); E06B 3/67343 (2013.01); E06B 3/67347 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29505433 U1 19950614; AT 193745 T 20000615; AT 401671 B 19961125; AT A47895 A 19960315; DE 19608901 A1 19960926; DE 19608901 C2 19980610; DE 59605377 D1 20000713; EP 0732478 A2 19960918; EP 0732478 A3 19970319; EP 0732478 B1 20000607; ES 2147359 T3 20000901; IT 240503 Y1 20010402; IT MI960184 U1 19970915; US 5759272 A 19980602

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160305

2016-03-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160305

2016-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-03-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605377

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59605377

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060307

2006-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-03-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060307

2006-03-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060307

2005-03-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-12-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: TECNOPAT AG

2003-07-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-03-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-03-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020321

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LISEC PETER

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2000-09-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-09-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147359 T3

2000-08-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605377 20000713

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193745 T 20000615

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990930

1999-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MANUAL SEALING DEVICE

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970318

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE