Global Patent Index - EP 0732554 B1

EP 0732554 B1 2000-11-22 - Evaporator, in particular for compressor-operated domestic refrigerators

Title (en)

Evaporator, in particular for compressor-operated domestic refrigerators

Title (de)

Verdampfer, insbesondere für verdichterbetriebene Haushalts-Kältegeräte

Title (fr)

Evaporateur, particulièrement pour des réfrigérateurs ménagers à compresseur

Publication

EP 0732554 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101434 A

Priority

DE 19509571 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732554A2] The evaporator (10) has at least two evaporator sections (11, 17, 22) with respective heat exchange surfaces, supplied with a refrigerant provided by a compressor via corresponding injection points (16, 20, 26). The evaporator sections are combined to form a common sheet metal plate, with slits providing in the surface of the plate providing relative thermal insulation of the evaporator sections from one another, allowing one of the evaporator sections to provide a heat exchange surface at a lower temp. than the other series sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 39/02; F28D 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0732554 A2 19960918; EP 0732554 A3 19970312; EP 0732554 B1 20001122; DE 19509571 A1 19960919; ES 2153506 T3 20010301; TR 9600151 A2 19961121

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606153

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59606153

- Effective date: 20150408

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130202

2014-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140408

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-05 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59606153

- Effective date: 20120207

2005-10-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050202

2004-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153506 T3

2001-02-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606153 20001228

2000-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981014

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981014

1998-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970828

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE