Global Patent Index - EP 0732560 B1

EP 0732560 B1 2001-05-23 - Tube-in-tube heat exchanger and process for producing same

Title (en)

Tube-in-tube heat exchanger and process for producing same

Title (de)

Doppelrohrwärmetauscher und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à tubes doubles et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0732560 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103446 A

Priority

DE 19509788 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732560A2] A turbulence device (8) can be inserted in the flow-channel. At least one all-round bulge-type union (9,10) is provided at both ends of the tubes (1,2) extending from at least one of the tubes. The height of the union corresponds to the difference of the radii of the inner wall of the outer and the outer wall of the inner tube. The union can be soldered to the tube wall with the turbulence device. Each union is pressed out of the material of the tube. One tube is smooth and the other at its two ends is formed with a bulge. The union can be produced by rolling in the end of the tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/10 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/0234 (2013.01); F28D 7/106 (2013.01); Y10S 165/916 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0732560 A2 19960918; EP 0732560 A3 19971029; EP 0732560 B1 20010523; DE 19509788 A1 19960919; US 5732769 A 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-08-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606931 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2001-05-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000811

1998-06-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980408

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE