Global Patent Index - EP 0732716 B1

EP 0732716 B1 2001-02-21 - Thermostatic protective switch

Title (en)

Thermostatic protective switch

Title (de)

Temperaturschutzschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur de protection thermostatique

Publication

EP 0732716 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103856 A

Priority

DE 19509656 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732716A2] A temperature protection or limit switch has a housing Ä10Ü that is open ended and fits onto a socket stage Ä1Ü. Internally there is a U-shaped carrier Ä4Ü that has the forked ends Ä3aÜ embedded into the socket and this carries a fixed contact pad Ä3cÜ. A movable contact pad Ä7aÜ is mounted on a bimetallic disc Ä7Ü that is supported by a bracket Ä8Ü fixed to the end of the carrier Ä5Ü. When a threshold temperature is reached the bimetallic disc inverts and the contacts open.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/04; H01H 37/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/5427 (2013.01); H01H 37/5418 (2013.01); H01H 2037/5463 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0732716 A2 19960918; EP 0732716 A3 19980408; EP 0732716 B1 20010221; DE 19509656 A1 19960919; DE 19509656 C2 19970116; ES 2154749 T3 20010416; US 5949322 A 19990907

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606446

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130313

2014-06-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140610

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-11-29 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59606446

- Effective date: 20120524

2012-05-24 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59606446

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110314

2012-01-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-10-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-06-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-03-22 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060111

2002-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THERMIK GERAETEBAU GMBH

2002-01-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THERMIK GERAETEBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154749 T3

2001-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606446 20010329

2001-03-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IE IT NL

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000725

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980518

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IE IT NL

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IE IT NL