Global patent index - EP 0732723 B1

EP 0732723 B1 2000-02-02 - Flat display screen with high inter-electrode distance

Title (en)

Flat display screen with high inter-electrode distance

Title (de)

Flaches Bildschirm mit hohem Inter-Elektrodenabstand

Title (fr)

Ecran plat de visualisation à distance inter-électrodes élevée

Publication

EP 0732723 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96410023 A

Priority

FR 9503376 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0732723A1] The screen is formed of two electrodes separated by an internal space. One of the electrodes is supported by a thin substrate and a thick rigid plate. The internal space is defined by a peripheral framework between the electrodes outside of their usable surface. The second electrode is carried on a thick rigid plate formed of a thick substrate. The internal face of the substrate forms the second electrode. The plate associated with the first electrode forms a base of the screen and has an orifice through.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 31/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/24 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/241 (2013.01); H01J 31/127 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0732723 A1 19960918; EP 0732723 B1 20000202; DE 69606446 D1 20000309; DE 69606446 T2 20000914; FR 2731840 A1 19960920; FR 2731840 B1 19970606; JP H08298086 A 19961112; US 5798609 A 19980825

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030806

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606446

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-09 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980205

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970219

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT