Global Patent Index - EP 0733139 B1

EP 0733139 B1 2000-04-05 - ROOF TILE SYSTEM

Title (en)

ROOF TILE SYSTEM

Title (de)

DACHZIEGELSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TUILE POUR TOIT

Publication

EP 0733139 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95902894 A

Priority

  • GB 9402723 W
  • GB 9325307 A
  • GB 9417250 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9516085A1] A weathering member (3) is positioned beneath the form between two adjacent tiles (1) on a roof, to catch water passing between them and feed it onto a tile (1) in the row below. The weathering member has upstands (8) which engage in recesses (10) in the under surfaces of tiles (1). Locating means (6) for the tiles (1) consist of a portion (11) passing between the tiles and a head (12) which engages the upper surfaces of the tiles. The weathering member (3) is attached to a roof batten (13) by means of a pair of legs (15) with portions (19) which engage the batten. In alternative arrangements a clip or a nail is used to secure the tiles to a weathering member and the member to the batten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/36; B28B 7/00; E04D 1/16; E04D 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/00 (2006.01); E04D 1/16 (2006.01); E04D 1/34 (2006.01); E04D 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/365 (2013.01); B28B 7/0055 (2013.01); E04D 1/16 (2013.01); E04D 1/34 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3414 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3417 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3423 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3432 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3438 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3461 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3476 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3494 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9516085 A1 19950615; AT 191529 T 20000415; DE 69423909 D1 20000511; EP 0733139 A1 19960925; EP 0733139 B1 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-07-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423909 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-04-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191529 T 20000415

2000-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARLEY TILE AG

2000-02-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

1999-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARLEY BUILDING MATERIALS LIMITED

1999-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARLEY TILE AG

1997-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970807

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960710

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE