Global Patent Index - EP 0733153 B1

EP 0733153 B1 2000-03-15 - A HYDRAULIC IMPACT MOTOR

Title (en)

A HYDRAULIC IMPACT MOTOR

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHER SCHLAGANTRIEB

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A PERCUSSION HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 0733153 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95919255 A

Priority

  • SE 9401196 W
  • SE 9304124 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9516847A1] A hydraulic impact motor in the form of a water-driven in-hole rock drilling machine has a valve spool (40) that has two equally big and opposite directed control surfaces (A1 and A2). The valve has also a third control surface (A3) which is smaller than the other two and which is continuously under pressure. The third control surface (A3) acts in the same direction as the second control surface (A2). When the first control surface (A1) is under pressure but the second control surface (A2) is not, then the valve is moved in one direction, and when the first and second control surfaces (A1 and A2) is under equal pressure (full pressure or no pressure), then the valve is moved in the other direction by the third control surface (A3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 4/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 1/00 (2006.01); E21B 1/26 (2006.01); E21B 1/28 (2006.01); E21B 4/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 4/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9516847 A1 19950622; AU 1286495 A 19950703; AU 685891 B2 19980129; DE 69423511 D1 20000420; DE 69423511 T2 20001102; EP 0733153 A1 19960925; EP 0733153 B1 20000315; ES 2146313 T3 20000801; JP 3393139 B2 20030407; JP H09506687 A 19970630; SE 505171 C2 19970707; SE 9304124 D0 19931213; SE 9304124 L 19950614

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111214

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111213

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111213

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111213

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69423511

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111213

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110405

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146313 T3

2000-06-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ORGANIZZAZIONE D'AGOSTINI

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423511 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990512

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960710

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT