Global Patent Index - EP 0733183 A4

EP 0733183 A4 2001-03-14 - ANTENNA MOUNTING SYSTEM

Title (en)

ANTENNA MOUNTING SYSTEM

Title (de)

ANTENNEN-MONTAGESYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME POUR MONTER DES ANTENNES

Publication

EP 0733183 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95902387 A

Priority

US 9411336 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9611352A1] An antenna assembly (90) comprising a pole (102) and an antenna mounting apparatus (100). The antenna mounting apparatus (100) is comprised of at least one sleeve (120) which is configured to be mounted on the pole (102). Advantageously, the sleeve (120) includes three antenna mounting members (128) which extend in a direction parallel to the pole (102). Flat panel directional antennas (110) are then attached to the antenna mounting members (128) in a manner where the antennas (110) also extend in a direction parallel to the pole (102) to thereby minimize the horizontal profile of the antenna mounting apparatus (100). The sleeve (120) can be mounted on a support collar (112) positioned to the pole (102) and can be rotated about the support collar (112) to a desired rotational orientation. A further embodiment of the present invention incorporates two sleeves (184), which can be positioned at different positions on the pole (102) with at least one antenna mounting member (128) extending therebetween.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; H01Q 21/08; H01Q 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2013.01); H01Q 1/1242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9611352 A1 19960418; AU 1126895 A 19960502; EP 0733183 A1 19960925; EP 0733183 A4 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040501

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020321

2001-03-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01Q 1/12 A, 7H 01Q 21/08 B, 7H 01Q 21/10 B

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01Q 1/12 A

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960629

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE