Global Patent Index - EP 0733246 B1

EP 0733246 B1 2001-03-28 - IMPROVED MINITEL$m(3)-CONSULTABLE COMPUTER-CONTROLLED 24-HOUR AUTOMATIC VENDING MACHINE FOR SALE OR HIRE OF ARTICLES

Title (en)

IMPROVED MINITEL$m(3)-CONSULTABLE COMPUTER-CONTROLLED 24-HOUR AUTOMATIC VENDING MACHINE FOR SALE OR HIRE OF ARTICLES

Title (de)

RECHNERGESTEUERTER UND ÜBER MINITEL $m(3) BETÄTIGBARER 24 h-WARENAUSGABEAUTOMAT FÜR ZUM VERKAUF ODER VERLEIH BESTIMMTE ARTIKEL

Title (fr)

PERFECTIONNEMENT D'UN DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE DE PRODUITS DESTINES A LA VENTE OU A LA LOCATION, FONCTIONNANT 24H/24H, PILOTE PAR UN ORDINATEUR ET CONSULTABLE PAR MINITEL$m(3)

Publication

EP 0733246 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95926991 A

Priority

  • FR 9501021 W
  • FR 9409786 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9604617A1] Vending machine disposed in a shielded cabinet (1) comprising a set of shelves (8) which are accessible by a novel gripping system (41) featuring hookable housings. The automated control system has three degrees of freedom and is mounted on a mechanical support with ball bearing sleeves. The customer can consult the computer (43) by Minitel3 to select and reserve the article of his choice, said computer also being used to monitor sales and provide remote testing and servicing in the event of minor problems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/1008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9604617 A1 19960215; AU 3117195 A 19960304; DE 69520489 D1 20010503; EP 0733246 A1 19960925; EP 0733246 B1 20010328; FR 2724478 A1 19960315; FR 2724478 B1 19961227

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010731

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060725

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-11 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

- Ref Legal Event Code: CL

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TRIELLI JEAN-PIERRE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TRIELLI PATRICK

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TRIELLI JACQUES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010731

2002-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AMAYENC JEAN-LUC

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-06-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69520489

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-03

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

2001-03-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

1998-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980716

1996-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960823

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB