Global Patent Index - EP 0733311 B1

EP 0733311 B1 2001-05-09 - Improved adhesive application apparatus provided with devices for automatically loading/unloading fabric portions to be reinforced

Title (en)

Improved adhesive application apparatus provided with devices for automatically loading/unloading fabric portions to be reinforced

Title (de)

Klebstoffauftragsvorrichtung zum automatischen Laden und Entladen von zu verstärkenden Gewebeteilen

Title (fr)

Appareilage d'application d'adhésif comprenant des dispositifs de chargement et déchargement automatiques des portions de tissus devant être renforcées

Publication

EP 0733311 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96830117 A

Priority

IT MI950574 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733311A2] The present invention relates to an improved adhesive application apparatus, characterized in that the apparatus includes devices for properly arranging the fabric portions to be bound, and also including a locating device comprising a plurality of conveyor belts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41H 43/02; A41H 43/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09J 5/00 (2006.01); A41H 43/02 (2006.01); A41H 43/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41H 43/04 (2013.01); A41H 43/0242 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733311 A2 19960925; EP 0733311 A3 19970326; EP 0733311 B1 20010509; DE 69612689 D1 20010613; DE 69612689 T2 20020207; ES 2158272 T3 20010901; IT 1275959 B1 19971024; IT MI950574 A1 19960923; IT MI950574 D0 19950322; JP H08302290 A 19961119; TR 199600238 A2 19970521

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-04-18 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2003-04-18 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2003-03-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-03-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030307

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020306

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158272 T3

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612689 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990211

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970506

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR