Global Patent Index - EP 0733316 B1

EP 0733316 B1 2000-08-02 - Coins and methods for producing coins

Title (en)

Coins and methods for producing coins

Title (de)

Münze und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Pièces de monnaie et leurs procédés de fabrication

Publication

EP 0733316 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96302032 A

Priority

GB 9505920 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733316A2] A coin comprises a substrate 20 having one or more coating layers 22,24 of a material or materials different from the substrate 20: a pattern or design is formed using a high power laser to cause localised melting and mixing or alloying of the coating layer and substrate, or of the superposed coating layers. This provides an observable or measurable effect, for establishing the authenticity of the coin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 21/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733316 A2 19960925; EP 0733316 A3 19980408; EP 0733316 B1 20000802; AT 195059 T 20000815; CA 2172169 A1 19960924; DE 69609544 D1 20000907; DE 69609544 T2 20001214; DK 0733316 T3 20001227; ES 2150635 T3 20001201; GB 9505920 D0 19950510; ZA 9602297 B 19960930

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050325

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030326

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-11-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *SOLICITOR FOR THE AFFAIRS OF HER MAJESTY'S TR

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *UNIVERSITY OF LIVERPOOL

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-03-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-03-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-05-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-10 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020410

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020320

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-19 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020319

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-21 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150635 T3

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609544 20000907

2000-09-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

2000-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195059 T 20000815

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990423

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980924

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

1997-01-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE