Global Patent Index - EP 0733323 B1

EP 0733323 B1 2000-06-14 - Support, particularly for felts, rubber pads, or sliding blocks adapted to be fixed to the bottom of legs or feet of furniture, chairs, or the like

Title (en)

Support, particularly for felts, rubber pads, or sliding blocks adapted to be fixed to the bottom of legs or feet of furniture, chairs, or the like

Title (de)

Stütze, insbesondere für Filze, Gummikissen oder Gleitstücke, die angepasst ist um unter den Füssen von Möbeln, Stühlen oder dergleichen montiert zu werden

Title (fr)

Support, particulièrement pour des patins de feutre ou de caoutchouc et des blocs glissants, adapté pour être fixé sur des pieds de meubles, chaises ou similaire

Publication

EP 0733323 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96104334 A

Priority

IT PD950019 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733323A1] The present invention relates to a support (10), particularly for felts or rubber pads (14), or sliding blocks (15) adapted to be fixed to the bottom of the legs or feet of furniture, chairs, or the like. The support (10) is constituted by a metal plate (11) wherefrom two or more points (12) protrude in positions that are eccentric with respect to the centroid of the plate (11). The points (12) protrude substantially at right angles to the plate (11), from a face thereof which is opposite to that associated with the felts or rubber pads (14), or sliding blocks (15). The points (12) penetrate in the bottom of the legs or feet of furniture, chairs, or the like upon assembly, and a rim (13) circumscribes the plate (11), and surrounds the felt or rubber pad (14), or sliding block (15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 91/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 91/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 91/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733323 A1 19960925; EP 0733323 B1 20000614; AT 193811 T 20000615; DE 69608836 D1 20000720; DE 69608836 T2 20001109; IT 239103 Y1 20010219; IT PD950019 U1 19960923; IT PD950019 V0 19950321

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070319

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070319

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070319

2006-05-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060505

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060310

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010319

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608836 20000720

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB LU NL

2000-06-14 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193811 T 20000615

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980730

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970225

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB LU NL