Global Patent Index - EP 0733325 B1

EP 0733325 B1 2000-08-09 - Slat for a undermattress

Title (en)

Slat for a undermattress

Title (de)

Federbrücke für eine Untermatratze

Title (fr)

Latte pour sommier

Publication

EP 0733325 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810175 A

Priority

  • CH 83495 A
  • CH 9600320 W
  • US 24237399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2001014984A1] The spring bridge (2) comprises a main, load-bearing bridge (6), which can be fitted in the frame of a mattress base, and one or more supporting elements (8) arranged thereon. The supporting elements (8) extend, preferably in the form of a sheet-like, wing-like lip, from the main, load-bearing bridge (6), in the lateral direction, transversely with respect to the longitudinal axis of the main, load-bearing bridge and project beyond the top side of the main, load-bearing bridge (6). They are designed such that their flexibility in relation to the main, load-bearing bridge counter to a bearing force, usually the locally active weight of a mattress which has been positioned on top and of a person who is resting on said mattress, is more yielding than the flexibility of the main, load-bearing bridge itself. The spring-bridge construction proposed, on the one hand, permits cost-effective production of a spring-bridge grille and, on the other hand, nevertheless provides the functions which are necessary for a high degree of lying comfort, in particular locally progressively adapting spring properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/02 (2006.01); A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

US 2001014984 A1 20010823; AT 195229 T 20000815; CN 1101168 C 20030212; CN 1229344 A 19990922; DE 59605692 D1 20000914; DK 0926970 T3 20010605; EP 0733325 A1 19960925; EP 0733325 B1 20000809; EP 0926970 A1 19990707; EP 0926970 B1 20010214; ES 2153974 T3 20010316; HK 1021881 A1 20030801; JP 2001500757 A 20010123; JP 3792729 B2 20060705; PT 926970 E 20010830; US 6256815 B1 20010710; WO 9811807 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 195229 T

- Effective date: 20160320

2016-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-03-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605692

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150312

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: THOMAS BETEILIGUNGS- UND VERMOEGENS GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: THOMAS BETEILIGUNGS- UND VERMOEGENS GMBH & CO. KG#WALKMUEHLENSTRASSE 93#27432 BREMERVOERDE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- THOMAS BETEILIGUNGS- UND VERMOEGENS GMBH & CO. KG#WALKMUEHLENSTRASSE 93#27432 BREMERVOERDE (DE)

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605692 20000914

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI

2000-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195229 T 20000815

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981201

1997-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMAS BETEILIGUNGS- UND VERMOEGENS GMBH & CO. KG

1997-04-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEGEN, HUGO

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961113

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI