Global Patent Index - EP 0733420 B1

EP 0733420 B1 2000-08-23 - Modular mould for continuous casting

Title (en)

Modular mould for continuous casting

Title (de)

Modular aufgebaute Stranggiesskokille

Title (fr)

Lingotière modulaire pour la coulée continue

Publication

EP 0733420 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810160 A

Priority

CH 84995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733420A1] The mould with a cylindrical mould space (10) is characterised by the following facts: (a) the mould elements (20,30) are detachably joined to one another by insertion of the inner sleeve (3) into the carrier structure (20); (b) the opposing sides of the sleeve and/or the carrier structure are shaped so that - when joined to one another - an annular space (32) located concentrically around the mould axis (m) is formed to constitute a second coolant chamber. Also claimed is a method for producing ingots with use of the proposed mould.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/049 (2006.01); B22D 11/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/049 (2013.01); B22D 11/055 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733420 A1 19960925; EP 0733420 B1 20000823; AT 195677 T 20000915; CA 2171790 A1 19960925; CH 689446 A5 19990430; DE 59605772 D1 20000928; IS 4331 A 19960925; NO 961167 A 19960925; NO 961167 D0 19960322; US 5785112 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020314

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010420

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-03 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010403

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605772 20000928

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195677 T 20000915

2000-03-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980803

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970325

1996-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALUSUISSE TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI