Global Patent Index - EP 0733490 B1

EP 0733490 B1 2000-07-05 - Form with integral removable card as well as multilayered material for its fabrication

Title (en)

Form with integral removable card as well as multilayered material for its fabrication

Title (de)

Formular mit integrierter, heraustrennbarer Karte sowie Mehrschichtmaterial zur Herstellung eines solchen Formulars

Title (fr)

Formulaire avec carte intégrée et séparable et matérial multicouche pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0733490 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810182 A

Priority

CH 84595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733490A1] The form (1) has an integrated, removable card (K). The card has parts (K1,K2) lying over each other and arranged next to each other in the form. The card parts are adherable together by folding them over each other. A carrier material (2) is adhered to the back (11) of the form. The card parts are fastened in the area of the carrier material via at least one stamping (S1,S2). The carrier material is fixed to the form by an adhesive layer (22) as well as a carrier layer (21). The front part of the carrier material is not adhered to the form so as to allow the carrier material to be removed in the area of the adhesive layer. The at least one stamping is formed through the front of the form at partly through and at most until the back of the adhesive layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/10; B42D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/04 (2006.01); B42D 5/02 (2006.01); B42D 25/00 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/47 (2014.10); B42D 5/027 (2013.01); B42D 25/00 (2014.10); B42D 2033/40 (2013.01); Y10S 428/913 (2013.01); Y10S 428/914 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24802 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24843 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24876 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31504 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733490 A1 19960925; EP 0733490 B1 20000705; AT 194313 T 20000715; AU 4828796 A 19961003; DE 29623636 U1 19990211; DE 59605530 D1 20000810; JP H0966688 A 19970311; NO 319577 B1 20050829; NO 961182 A 19960925; NO 961182 D0 19960322; US 5916665 A 19990629; ZA 9602308 B 19960927

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080321

2007-03-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. JOACHIM LAUER PATENTANWALT

2002-04-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020312

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FOFITEC A.G.

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SINNHUBER BERNHARD

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-01-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-10-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605530 20000810

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HUG INTERLIZENZ AG

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-07-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194313 T 20000715

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOFITEC AG

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SINNHUBER, BERNHARD

1997-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971017

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961012

1996-11-20 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE