Global Patent Index - EP 0733524 A8

EP 0733524 A8 2001-04-04 - Electric anti-theft device, especially for a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Electric anti-theft device, especially for a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Elektrische Diebstahlsicherung, insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Antivol électrique, notamment pour un véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0733524 A8 (FR)

Application

EP 96400556 A

Priority

  • FR 9503395 A
  • US 62331596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733524A1] The electrical anti-theft system (10) includes an anti-theft switch (12) for controlling the engine starting circuits (DEM), and controlling the supply to other electrical circuits (ACC, ALL). A key-operated switch (14) is provided to detect the simulation of the introduction of a key, and a motorised locking device (34) is incorporated in the circuit. The fixed contact of the starter switch is connected to the starter by means of an inhibitor (80) which only establishes the supply to the starter when the alarm system is in its unlocked state. A circuit (64) detects the locked or unlocked state of the anti-theft circuit, and delivers an appropriate signal to the ant-theft central control system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 25/021 (2013.01); B60R 25/04 (2006.01); B60R 25/20 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 25/021 (2013.01); B60R 25/04 (2013.01); B60R 25/2063 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5934 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733524 A1 19960925; EP 0733524 A3 20010411; EP 0733524 A8 20010404; EP 0733524 B1 20020227; DE 69619413 D1 20020404; DE 69619413 T2 20021114; ES 2172643 T3 20021001; FR 2731968 A1 19960927; FR 2731968 B1 19970430; US 5808543 A 19980915

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070318

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060321

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060318

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060321

2006-03-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060318

2005-03-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050304

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-02-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172643

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020422

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69619413

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-04

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-03-28 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991124

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970321

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT