Global Patent Index - EP 0733738 B1

EP 0733738 B1 2000-06-28 - Method of manufacture of a rail support and support obtained according to this method

Title (en)

Method of manufacture of a rail support and support obtained according to this method

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren für eine Eisenbahnschienenunterstützung und nach dem Verfahren hergstellte Unterstützung

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un support de rail de chemin de fer, et support susceptible d'être obtenu par la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 0733738 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400568 A

Priority

FR 9503199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733738A1] The rail support sleeper comprises a block (2) of reinforced concrete (38) and a visco-elastic bedplate (8). The block upper face takes the rail and its lower face (6) supports the block on ballast. The bedplate covering the lower face acts as an intermediate support between the ballast and the block. The manufacturing procedure involves a visco-elastic plate (18) having the same dimensions as the bedplate is prefabricated. During this phase chippings (27) are regularly distributed and attached onto one face (20) of the plate. The block is made by moulding concrete in a mould and the prefabricated plate integrated with it to form the bedplate. During moulding the plate is placed so that its chipping face coincides with the block lower face so that the chippings are integrated into the concrete.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 1/00; E01B 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 19/00 (2006.01); E01B 1/00 (2006.01); E01B 3/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/001 (2013.01); B28B 19/0046 (2013.01); E01B 3/46 (2013.01); E01B 2204/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733738 A1 19960925; EP 0733738 B1 20000628; AT 194180 T 20000715; DE 69608985 D1 20000803; DE 69608985 T2 20001130; ES 2147349 T3 20000901; FR 2732046 A1 19960927; FR 2732046 B1 19970620

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150320

2016-04-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160427

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150319

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150319

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150319

2015-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 194180 T

- Effective date: 20150319

2015-10-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150319

2015-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608985

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110319

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SOCIETE ANONYME DE TRAVERSES EN BETON ARME SYSTEM

- Free text: SOCIETE ANONYME DE TRAVERSES EN BETON ARME SYSTEME VAGNEUX#262, BOULEVARD SAINT-GERMAIN#75007 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- SOCIETE ANONYME DE TRAVERSES EN BETON ARME SYSTEME VAGNEUX#262, BOULEVARD SAINT-GERMAIN#75007 PARIS (FR)

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147349 T3

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608985 20000803

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CON LOR S.R.L.

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194180 T 20000715

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990805

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970324

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU